RECREATION HUT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Village Hall facilities for the benefit of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £34,137 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 May 1963: Standard registration
- WIGHTON VILLAGE RECREATION HUT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Edward Brett-Reynolds | Chair | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Skinner | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hiner Mrs | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dyson Mrs | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Freeman | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ABLE | Trustee | 22 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MARGARET CLARK | Trustee | 28 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWIN HARRISON | Trustee |
|
||||||
COMMITTEE MEMBER JULIE ANN PIGGOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £12.30k | £1.44k | £389.59k | £355.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49k | £1.08k | £6.19k | £12.00k | £740.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £34.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27 OCTOBER 1952 TRUST DEED DATED 27 OCTOBER 1952
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WIGHTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 High Street
Wighton
Wells-next-the-Sea
NR23 1AL
- Phone:
- 01328820678
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window