WOODBASTWICK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall is a community resource for the village and surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lara Cole | Chair | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas McKenna | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Tilsley | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Read | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Woods | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Neil Logsdon | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Hamilton | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Mary Woods | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
NORMA JABLONOWSKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR A J CATOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JABLONOWSKI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.36k | £17.51k | £2.66k | £2.80k | £4.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.95k | £4.93k | £4.75k | £2.15k | £4.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £16.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18TH OCTOBER 1948
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WOODBASTWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Vicarage
The Green
Woodbastwick
NORWICH
NR13 6HH
- Phone:
- 0791 591 4180
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window