WOOD DALLING VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fetes, Quizz Nights, Race Nights, Film nights,Coffee mornings, Hall lettings and Recycling glass and newspaper. WiFi installation for student & business use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Keith Rengert | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
charles edward clark | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
rory harrold | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.40k | £4.98k | £20.37k | £13.85k | £4.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.49k | £6.88k | £3.86k | £13.87k | £10.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.91k | £10.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH JUNE 1959
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WOOD DALLING AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Wood Dalling
NORWICH
NR11 6RW
- Phone:
- 01263 587303
- Email:
- wdvillagehall@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window