Trustees THE NORFOLK COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 304155

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Rowe | Chair | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Sinclair | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Stewart | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Chusonis | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michele Valerie O'Keefe | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Russell Wright | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HARROWVEN | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lily-Mai Gypsy Spinks | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Elizabeth Gostling | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Lupson | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.