Trustees MEMORIAL HALL - BRAUNSTON
Charity Number: 304163

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Richard Pomfret | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Grossart | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Patterson | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Fiona Astley | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brown | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Arnett | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Robert Adams | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tina Newman | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Hick | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carrie-Ann Biggs | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Liz Fraser | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Mawer | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.