THE GLAPTHORN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide and maintain a village hall for the benefit of Glapthorn Villagers and members of the nearby communities. As managing trustees we also run social events and entertainments for the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 15 January 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Chapple | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN HOOD | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHINDO BETTLEY | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER DERRICK BETTLEY | Trustee | 05 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR NICK KNOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEFFREY KNOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.86k | £10.53k | £7.90k | £8.65k | £4.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.33k | £3.09k | £13.17k | £9.56k | £7.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 22ND NOVEMBER, 1960
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GLAPTHORN
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHESTNUT TREE
SOUTHWICK ROAD
GLAPTHORN
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 5BD
- Phone:
- 07802736192
- Email:
- nwk@enigmasecurity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window