Financial history GREAT DODDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 304197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £16.62k £8.52k £12.73k £16.30k £22.51k
Total expenditure £13.15k £8.12k £11.62k £17.68k £18.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £2.67k N/A N/A