GREAT DODDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Great Doddington Memorial Hall was built for the benefit of all the residents of the village and surrounding area. It is run by a small committee of volunteers. It provides a venue for local organisations to hold meetings and participate in activities, as well as being an ideal venue for parties, dances, concerts, and a variety of fundraising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 28 November 1962: Standard registration
- GREAT DODDINGTON MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID SMITH | Chair | 05 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Dipesh Dhirajlal Ghelani | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alan Ryder | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.62k | £8.52k | £12.73k | £16.30k | £22.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.15k | £8.12k | £11.62k | £17.68k | £18.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH DECEMBER 1960
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
GREAT DODDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Memorial Hall
42b High Street
Great Doddington
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN29 7TQ
- Phone:
- 01933 279003
- Website:
-
great-doddington-memorial-hall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window