KEYSTONE ESCAPE YOUTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purpose, relief of poverty, Arts / Culture, Sports / recreation Providing services / advocacy & advice / buildings, facilities & open space For Primarily Children & Young people but also elderly / old people and other groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 07 May 1962: Standard registration
- KEYSTONE ESCAPE YOUTH CENTRE (Working name)
- THE KETTERING KEYSTONE BOYS' CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LANE | Chair | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
James Varlow | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Rowley | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Arlette Wrighting | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.09k | £16.12k | £16.09k | £16.09k | £20.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.20k | £16.10k | £16.27k | £18.55k | £18.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH MARCH 1962, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 AUGUST 2003.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF HELPING AND EDUCATING YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
KETTERING
Contact information
- Address:
-
173 KINGSLEY AVENUE
KETTERING
NN16 9ES
- Phone:
- 01536 518339
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window