THE EDITH CATHERINE COWLEY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hall is used for the benefit of the village. All village associations use the Hall, Youth Club, Scouts, Playtime, Bowls, Art, WI, Zumba, Pilates, Martial Arts, Theatrical Society, Gardening Association, History Society. Parish Council meetings are also held in the Hall, together with National Associations because of the Hall's geographical position.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 22 November 1962: Standard registration
- KILSBY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Michael McGuire | Chair | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Chamberlain | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Keren Woods | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Smith | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Bunyan | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR TOM HINDLE | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
RONALD MASON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.05k | £79.31k | £7.39k | £15.85k | £21.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.78k | £17.14k | £12.66k | £10.88k | £12.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 14 March 2022 | 560 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 20 May 2022 | 627 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5TH SEPTEMBER 1952
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL TO BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVEOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PARISHONERS OF THE PARISH OF KILSBY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER PROBLEMS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KILSBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Daventry Road
Kilsby
RUGBY
CV23 8XF
- Phone:
- 01788823707
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window