ORTON TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are the advancing of public education in the arts of stone masonry. Our operation is based at Orton, Kettering, Northants NN14 1LJ (please see our website for full particulars) open to all interested in the craft of stonemasonry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 1969: Standard registration
- 18 November 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 18 November 2022: Funds transferred to 205846 THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.01k | £5.62k | £4.75k | £2.82k | £68 | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.84k | £20.60k | £20.46k | £40.25k | £4.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 19 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/10/1968 AS AMENDED ON 12/02/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ART OF STONE MASONARY WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES, WITH REGARD IN PARTICULAR TO THE DIOCESE OF PETERBOROUGH, BY PROMOTING THE CRAFT CENTRE AT ALL SAINTS ORTON.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window