Financial history PATTISHALL PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 304233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.73k £47.46k £7.70k £7.12k £5.88k
Total expenditure £2.50k £59.43k £2.84k £6.92k £5.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.73k N/A N/A N/A