RUSHTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain a Village Hall for the benefit of all persons within the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 02 August 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN J ABRAHAM | Chair | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIANNE GARDINER | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Gardiner | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER PAIN | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Graham Brightman | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin O'Brien | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toni Orwin | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Parker | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN JOHN ABRAHAM | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Wass | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.15k | £10.15k | £13.03k | £9.18k | £16.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.05k | £4.91k | £5.74k | £6.03k | £9.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 24TH JUNE 1965
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF RUSHTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR TO POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
RUSHTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 MIDLAND COTTAGES
RUSHTON
KETTERING
NN14 1RJ
- Phone:
- 07713416249
- Email:
- kjabra@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window