THRAPSTON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club meets every Monday evening and activitie vary from talks to visits to taking part in County organised activities. We hold a few fund raising events each year including an annual Ball, ploughing marathon and fancy dress disco.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 23 August 1972: Standard registration
- THRAPSTON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB (Working name)
- THRAPSTON YFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deniel Coburn | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Glentworth | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Calvin Joe Hawkins | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
DANIEL EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/07/2020 | 16/07/2021 | 16/07/2022 | 16/07/2023 | 16/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £150 | £250 | £2.18k | £6.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13k | £550 | £250 | £2.08k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 July 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 July 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 July 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 July 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS ADOPTED ON 5TH JUNE 1972
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOMECRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS; AND IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE, AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY WILL GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
THRAPSTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thrapston YFC
YFC Office
Moulton College
Lodge Farm
Moulton
NN3 7QL
- Phone:
- 07919261036
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window