CHINNOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HIRING OF HALL TO LOCAL ORGANISATIONS FOR CHARITY EVENTS AND LEISURE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 May 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Mantle | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Millard | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Dingwall | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Moore | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUE ASHDOWN | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Zena Baker | Trustee | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.04k | £31.79k | £13.31k | £42.81k | £24.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.42k | £24.34k | £16.41k | £17.68k | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.20k | £10.20k | £2.72k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED THE 12 SEPTEMBER 2002, AMENDED 21 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF CHINNOR AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHINNOR ANDTHE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Van Diemens Close
CHINNOR
Oxfordshire
OX39 4QE
- Phone:
- 07599725942
- Email:
- cvh2003@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window