DUNS TEW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meetings (formal and social), theatrical and musical performances, sporting and other leisure activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 October 1970: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Taylor | Chair | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Wilesmith | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE EATON | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR MARTIN FAIRFAX-CHOLMELEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.46k | £14.51k | £7.94k | £12.28k | £13.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.57k | £8.36k | £4.60k | £29.47k | £11.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 04 December 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 10 December 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 23 JULY 1970
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DUNS TEW
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 MAIN STREET
DUNS TEW
BICESTER
OX25 6JL
- Phone:
- 01869347106
- Email:
- MARTIN@CHOLMELEY.ORG
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window