Accounts and annual returns FIFIELD MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 304300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 August 2024 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 March 2023 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 February 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required