HIGHMOOR CROSS MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 304316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

"The charity maintains the Village Hall in memory of Hugh MacIntyre and of all inhabitants of the village of Highmoor who died in the 14-18 war, as a public, village hall, for physical or mental training and recreation, and social, moral and intellectual development, for the benefit of inhabitants of the village and vicinity, without distinction of sex or political, religious or other opinions"

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £14,020
Total expenditure: £13,804

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DEBBIE WARREN-PRICE Trustee
None on record
RICHARD DE VERE STACPOOLE Trustee
None on record
GWEN PRAGNELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.79k £8.60k £8.73k £12.60k £14.02k
Total expenditure £20.08k £7.76k £11.59k £12.23k £13.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 July 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 November 2021 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Smallbones Cottage
Highmoor Cross
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
Oxfordshire
RG9 5DX
Phone:
01491641113
Website:

No information available