Financial history THE BALDONS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.10k £11.56k £7.84k £9.86k £8.57k
Total expenditure £6.08k £6.80k £6.33k £18.06k £7.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.23k N/A N/A N/A