A J DE SALES LA TERRIERE FOR RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sports & Social
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 February 1963: Standard registration
- Trustees of Minster Lovell Recreation Ground (Working name)
- WASH MEADOW TRUSTEES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Crowther | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dick | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN GUY FINLINSON STOWELL | Trustee | 09 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN A CROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.80k | £12.75k | £2.75k | £5.75k | £5.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.99k | £5.12k | £4.34k | £3.47k | £4.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 12 September 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 2 MAY 1999.
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MINSTER LOVELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spar Stores
4 Brize Norton Road
Minster Lovell
WITNEY
OX29 0SE
- Phone:
- 01993775402
- Email:
- dave.lewis@thesparshop.co.uk
- Website:
-
None
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window