Trustees VILLAGE HALL - STANDLAKE

Charity number: 304372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Tamblyn Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
James Clements Trustee 09 March 2023
None on record
Ann Leggett Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
David Jeffcoat Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record
Rebecca Hoskin Trustee 20 January 2018
None on record
SHEILA HALLIDAY Trustee 01 September 2011
None on record
BARRY BARBER Trustee 01 September 2011
None on record
CHARLES POTTER Trustee
None on record