STANTON HARCOURT MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGEMENT OF VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE VILLAGE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE EAGLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Janet Mols | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Morley | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Vivien Tomlinson | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Pryse | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANNE PARKER | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET SELLARS | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY GILGRASS | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LINDA BEILBY | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA SENSECALL | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Marie Heath | Trustee | 14 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAY ELIZABETH POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.00k | £14.06k | £32.44k | £19.68k | £20.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.11k | £6.78k | £15.40k | £19.67k | £19.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £21.73k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23RD OCTOBER 1953
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
STANTON HARCOURT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Golden Bridge Cottage
Sutton Lane
Sutton
WITNEY
OX29 5RU
- Phone:
- 01865880736
- Email:
- lucy.heath1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window