Trustees TAYNTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304383

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE ELIZABETH SOHN | Chair | 07 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Neil Puckett | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Clarke | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Ann Pinchbeck | Trustee | 03 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Roberts | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sutton | Trustee | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Roberts | Trustee | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lexi Young | Trustee | 28 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.