TIDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings/facilities/open space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 21 January 1963: Standard registration
- CHILDREN'S PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorna Marie Moles | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Mary Malin | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth McKinney | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH FIELD | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Boswell | Trustee | 27 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert McKinney | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.76k | £21.25k | £9.47k | £12.94k | £12.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.99k | £9.78k | £16.75k | £17.64k | £18.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1950 AS AMENDED 10 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A CHILDREN'S PLAYING FIELD AND A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TIDDINGTON WITH ALLUBRY AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 STATION YARD
TIDDINGTON
THAME
OX9 2FG
- Phone:
- 07795576344
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window