WIGGINTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stewardship and maintenance of Wigginton Village Hall, an essential village amenity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 05 February 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Langley | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kim Winter | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kylie Cobb-Stanier | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Horton-Harpin | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Rowland | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICK SALT | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.82k | £2.28k | £1.32k | £6.08k | £5.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.11k | £1.09k | £681 | £4.15k | £2.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 January 2023 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 April 2022 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 February 2022 | 468 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1965
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
WIGGINTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pretty Bush Barn
Wigginton
BANBURY
Oxfordshire
OX15 4LD
- Phone:
- 01608737626
- Website:
-
wiggintonvillagehall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window