NENE VALLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes Scouting throughout East Northamptonshire Council area. Provides facilities and equipment to further this. Provides training to UK Scouting requirements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 October 1963: Standard registration
- RUSHDEN BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN WINIFRED TONKS | Chair | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Grant | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Elizabeth Cowan | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ward | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frederick George Harris | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michele Hunt | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Bass | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY ROBERT KNOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLARE BING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.30k | £21.60k | £62.04k | £69.75k | £77.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.33k | £6.97k | £57.22k | £60.52k | £69.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 June 2022 | 499 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 30TH DECEMBER 1941 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1935
Charitable objects
RUSHDEN BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
RUSHDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 London Road
Raunds
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN9 6EH
- Phone:
- 01933622598
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window