YELVERTOFT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Village Hall facilities for local organisations, including hall, sports field, kitchen, pocket park, children's play area, skateboard park. Maintenence of these facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £2,121 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 20 November 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER BENJAMIN LLOYD GRIFFITHS BSC DIPFLI | Chair | 17 August 1998 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Ruth Mills | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Cummings Mr | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Stephen Mercer | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Elaine Pittam | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Lowther | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alan Larder | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Rawes | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GRANVILLE FLANAGAN | Trustee | 15 February 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.31k | £40.51k | £38.76k | £53.22k | £36.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.34k | £27.13k | £51.53k | £39.72k | £36.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.13k | £27.44k | £6.51k | £2.50k | £2.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 10/09/1952. AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 15 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH AND PARISHES OF YELVERTOFT, ELIKINGTON, CLAY COTON AND STANFORD ON AVON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF YELVERTOFT
Contact information
- Address:
-
OCTOBER HOUSE
HIGH STREET
YELVERTOFT
NORTHAMPTON
NN6 6LF
- Phone:
- 01788 822124
- Email:
- colincummings@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window