TEMPLECOMBE RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recreation Ground facilities,which include tennis courts, football pitches, BMX track, Club house and changing rooms, Children's play area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 April 1963: Standard registration
- TEMPLE COOMBE RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Michael Cave | Chair | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Neil Molineux | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Kathleen Vaughan | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Alison Dorothy McAree | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Jack Savage | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Bassett | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Arthur Hood | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
TINA JANE CHAPMAN | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|||||
ALLAN RAYMOND KERRY | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS SARAH WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.78k | £12.03k | £12.58k | £12.30k | £12.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.64k | £8.87k | £15.85k | £18.41k | £11.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 27 JUNE 1929
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
TEMPLECOMBE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 SLADES HILL
TEMPLECOMBE
BA8 0HF
- Phone:
- 01963370527
- Website:
-
abbasandtemplecombe-pc.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window