Financial history ASH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.28k £27.01k £12.60k £6.71k £6.13k
Total expenditure £13.62k £18.20k £4.67k £7.96k £3.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.67k £8.00k N/A N/A