BALTONSBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide & maintain a village hall and playing field for the benefit of people within the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 April 1970: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Brian Pelly | Chair | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Long | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Stewart Faulkener | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Cotton | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Genia Pirrie | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Hyldon | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Franks | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eric Ashley Conway | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE RITCHIE | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Amanda Clow | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Ludovic Ghislain Medlicott | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Sessions | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.70k | £29.31k | £49.58k | £45.54k | £34.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.55k | £19.79k | £21.78k | £42.79k | £38.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £13.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.60k | £21.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 161 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED 29TH JANUARY 1970 as amended on 14 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND AND FACILITIES ANCILLARY THERETO AND IF THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT THINK FIT, A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BALTONSBOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Baltonsborough Village Hall
Ham Street
Baltonsborough
GLASTONBURY
Somerset
BA6 8PX
- Phone:
- 01458580754
- Website:
-
baltonsborough.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window