Trustees CLAVERTON DOWN COMMUNITY HALL
Charity number: 304478

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Margaret Doubleday | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sue Kuhn | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Morgan | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Evans | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norma Bishton | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Beezley | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Stuart Haynes | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Haynes | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PAUL MORGAN | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR PATRICK TERENCE MAGEE | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ALSOP | Trustee | 04 June 2011 |
|
|||||
Dr DAVID JOHN MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS BEEZLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.