Trustees BECKINGTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 304484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Suzanne Patricia Chillman Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Laura Elizabeth Parry Trustee 24 October 2022
None on record
Sara Vian Coffield Trustee 09 December 2019
None on record
Michael Christopher Collins Trustee 21 October 2019
None on record
Stan Wilson Trustee 08 June 2015
None on record
David Anthony Norman Trustee
None on record