GURNEY SLADE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 August 1962: Standard registration
- BINEGAR MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- GURNEY SLADE & BINEGAR MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Sheppard | Chair | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tonia James | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen William Goodwin Rawlings | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Rawlings | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Elaine Abbott | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Charles Abbott | Trustee | 15 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.51k | £14.44k | £11.13k | £13.82k | £10.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.23k | £8.54k | £4.65k | £8.66k | £13.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | £3.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 July 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1ST APRIL 1980
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BINEGAR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF BINEGAR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Firs
Station Road
Binegar
RADSTOCK
BA3 4UQ
- Phone:
- 07528169533
- Email:
- sdrawlings@mbzonline.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window