BISHOPS HULL VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the provision & maintenance of a Hall & Community Room & Playing Field for use by residents of Bishop's Hull
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 15 December 1966: Standard registration
- BISHOPS HULL PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL FREDERICK BULBECK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Thomas Sargent | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Prior-Sankey | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rick Moon | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Gallagher | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HURST | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Hunt | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Phillip Hughes | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAY COURT | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN LOCK | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR DON CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN GUPPY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON ATHERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR PHIL SUMMERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEENA GRINTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATRINA BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JORGENSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR JOHN DESAVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.35k | £76.09k | £29.07k | £14.16k | £16.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.01k | £23.08k | £33.83k | £36.79k | £21.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.70k | £47.84k | N/A | £1.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FULLY REGULATING SCHEME DATED 14.7.98.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF A PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
BISHOPS HULL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 MOUNTWAY ROAD
BISHOPS HULL
TAUNTON
TA1 5LS
- Phone:
- 01823338242
- Email:
- sathers@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window