Accounts and annual returns THORNE COFFIN MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 304498
Charity reporting is overdue by 345 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 345 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 345 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required