BURNHAM/HIGHBRIDGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of premises & support staff for activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 02 May 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip John Harvey | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacki Lucas | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henry Nevill | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Easton | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Harrison | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Walter John Norton | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Nichols | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Henry Allen Owen | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thorne | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hambleton | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Crosby | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Kenneth Hindle BEM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.87k | £32.23k | £39.55k | £86.43k | £52.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.62k | £29.11k | £41.29k | £68.75k | £54.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £23.27k | £13.17k | £18.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH DECEMBER, 1964 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 2010 as amended on 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION
Area of benefit
BURNHAM-ON-SEA AND HIGHBRIDGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY POSTCODES TA8 AND TA9
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burnham & Highbridge Community Cent
5 Berrow Road
BURNHAM-ON-SEA
TA8 2ET
- Phone:
- 01278792666
- Email:
- burnhamcc@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window