8TH ST MARYLEBONE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To operate as a unit of and in accordance with the broad objectives of the scout association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
76 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 17 December 1963: Standard registration
- 25 November 2022: Funds received from 303880 1ST ST MARYLEBONE SCOUT GROUP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL HARVEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Craig Aitchison | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jatin Dineshrai Ondhia | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hemani Devika Mandri Pathirana | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Larkin | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|||||
NIGEL RICHARD HART | Trustee | 03 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR CLIFF JORDAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN LARKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TONY THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.49k | £73.29k | £88.00k | £128.55k | £103.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.26k | £61.05k | £44.18k | £106.60k | £67.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £29.22k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LAND CERTIFICATE DATED 24TH JULY 1967 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
ST MARYLEBONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Hill Road
St John's Wood
LONDON
NW8 9QG
- Phone:
- 02072868210
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window