VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hire of premises to a number local organisations, and also to individuals. Hiring of musicians/entertainers for concerts. Maintaining the building in good condition and carrying out improvements. Encouraging wider use of Hall by local residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 12 March 1962: Standard registration
- CHAFFCOMBE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR STAN ROBINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Roger Ian Lindsay | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Ronald William Selley | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ISABELLE MARY BUTLER | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Ainsworth | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE BRACHER | Trustee | 11 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr David Maurice Bracher | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rowland George Butler | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISON OTTERBECK | Trustee | 19 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rachel BALE | Trustee | 20 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE ELIZABETH IREDALE DIP AD ATC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE MILES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.19k | £17.34k | £1.91k | £9.12k | £5.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.18k | £9.53k | £2.08k | £6.01k | £7.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
CHAFFCOMBE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lydmarsh Farm
Lydmarsh
Chard
Somerset
TA20 4AD
- Phone:
- 0146065730
- Email:
- agrmbale@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window