CHEWTON MENDIP VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main facility provided is a village hall - so that activities by groups of persons can congregate for social, educational, physical and religious bodies meeting place.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 June 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Edward Powell | Chair | 14 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Andrew Miles | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Curtis | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Judge | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Walker | Trustee | 26 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD ADDICOTT | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID HELLARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.50k | £12.73k | £18.67k | £5.12k | £3.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.98k | £3.94k | £4.44k | £5.24k | £3.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21ST JUNE 1990 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHEWTON MENDIP AS CONSTITUTED ON 16TH DECEMBER 1959 WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CHEWTON MENDIP
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barrow House
Kings Court
Chewton Mendip
RADSTOCK
BA3 4PF
- Phone:
- 01761241436
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window