Trustees CHURCHINFORD AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sean Peter Dyer Chair 02 September 2022
None on record
Jill Fussell Trustee 25 January 2024
None on record
Stuart John Wardle Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Stuart Christopher Blatcher Trustee 29 May 2020
None on record
Robert Ferguson Trustee 16 January 2020
None on record
Peter John Richard Knapp Trustee 02 October 2017
None on record
JOHN CHILCOTT Trustee 11 June 2013
None on record
CAROLINE SUSAN NIX Trustee 20 February 2013
None on record
LINDA KNOWLES Trustee 05 April 2011
None on record