Accounts and annual returns THE HERBERT GARDENS

Charity number: 304519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 October 2024 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 February 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 March 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required