Financial history CLEVEDON YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 304520
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £63.47k £71.59k £70.54k £58.12k £12.33k
Total expenditure £45.29k £35.77k £53.26k £47.22k £29.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.10k £52.53k £34.93k £33.10k N/A