VILLAGE HALL CORFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is responsible for managing and maintaining Corfe Village Hall.The hall is owned by Corfe Parish Council and leased to the charity.Our income comes from renting the hall out to village organisations, other public organisations and to private individuals. Our expenses are all related to insuring, running and maintaining the hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Hudson | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Hollins | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bowers | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Nigel Furniss | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Ruth Pickles | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|||||
SHEILA ANDREWS | Trustee | 11 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH DEREK GOSLING | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR CHRIS BROWN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.80k | £22.41k | £18.12k | £7.82k | £13.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.48k | £3.61k | £9.73k | £6.09k | £8.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.47k | £11.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1951
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OF OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CORFE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CORFE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
EDGECOMBE
MILL LANE
CORFE
TAUNTON
TA3 7AH
- Phone:
- 01823421798
- Email:
- dproyle@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window