DRAYTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
METING FACILITIES FOR VILLAGE GROUPS & SOCEITIES EDUCATIONAL CLASSES SOCIAL EVENTS FOR THE VILLAGE & LOCAL COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 March 1971: Standard registration
- DRAYTON SCHOOL HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elisabeth Black | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Timothy Charles Donaldson | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Brown | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jayne Donaldson | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Speakman | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Harry Tipping | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA COOMBE | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MONICA BRENNAN | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA CURTIS | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
RUTH THOMAS BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.91k | £25.12k | £8.76k | £10.61k | £6.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.26k | £5.87k | £6.79k | £11.79k | £22.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.67k | N/A | £155 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 DECEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
DRAYTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LODGE
NORTH STREET
DRAYTON
LANGPORT
TA10 0LE
- Phone:
- 01458251687
- Email:
- ruthvthomas@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window