TUNLEY RECREATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tunley Recreation Centre comprises a hall, sports field, meadow and children's play area, in all some 7 acres. Activities include dog training group, exercise classes, football club and other community events including meetings and private functions all serving a village community and the wider area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 28 April 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jon Boon | Chair | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Gilbert | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Gudge | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gena Goldfield | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Imhasly | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE DIX | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Salter | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WADSWORTH | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Watson | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.27k | £25.41k | £16.83k | £9.17k | £14.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.07k | £9.57k | £8.16k | £13.74k | £10.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.17k | £20.64k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9 FEBRUARY 1970 AS AMENDED ON 13 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND, PLAYING FIELD AND, IF THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT THINK FIT, A COMMUNITY CENTRE, FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR,THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL EXERCISE AND TRAINING, MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND SUCH OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION HAVING THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DUNKERTON AND PRISTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newlands
Tunley
BATH
BA2 0DR
- Phone:
- 07410452685
- Email:
- jondboon@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window