EVERCREECH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a safe and comfortable environment for all our user groups and hirers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR NIC JEFFERIS | Chair | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY SPENCER JESSOP | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE LOUISE BAKER | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RICHARD CHURCH | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA WILCOX | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN PHYLLIS LINDSAY | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ASHWORTH | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN CHARLES HOLE | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
GAIL WAKEFORD | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR RICHARD KEWISH | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA JOYCE PILBEAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET CATRIONA RUNDLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.45k | £16.08k | £22.57k | £10.56k | £18.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.79k | £10.25k | £10.71k | £18.42k | £30.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £18.10k | £3.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 December 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EVERCREECH AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
EVERCREECH VILLAGE HALL
VICTORIA SQUARE
EVERCREECH
SHEPTON MALLET
BA4 6JP
- Phone:
- 07810055996
- Email:
- evercreechvh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window