Trustees FAILAND VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304540

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Green | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Rhys Walrond | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marion Pearce | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Lamb | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Garfitt | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Nicholas Williams | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dwara Jepson | Trustee | 24 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Chilcott | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANGIE SISSONS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.