MARY BAILY PLAYING FIELD

Charity Number: 304547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's activity is to keep the open space open to the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE MISS MARY BAILEY PLAYING FIELD (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Frome Town Council Trustee
THEODORA ANN LE GROS FOR AN OPEN SPACE
Received: On time
FROME MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 April 2024 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FROME TOWN HALL
Frome Town Hall
Christchurch Street West
FROME
BA11 1EB
Phone:
01373465757