LADY ALICE MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for the inhabitants of the Parish of Hatch Beauchamp for recreation or other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving the conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £93,999 from 3 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 05 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TAMSIN FRENCH | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
IVOR SHEPPARD | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
CAROL WALTER | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Cope | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamyn Toms | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Piper | Trustee | 23 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Derbyshire | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
KIM BRISTOW | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JONES | Trustee | 22 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN SYLVIA JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.17k | £25.15k | £29.96k | £24.31k | £107.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.65k | £11.74k | £16.35k | £25.36k | £140.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.44k | £11.57k | £18.25k | £3.09k | £94.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22 JUNE 1978
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HATCH BEAUCHAMP.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HATCH BEAUCHAMP
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Station Road
Hatch Beauchamp
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA3 6SQ
- Phone:
- 01823 481105
- Email:
- sajwilliams@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window