HOLCOMBE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community groups, fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 03 May 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Marcia James | Chair | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
jane dyson | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Blount | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SINDEN | Trustee | 28 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BLOUNT | Trustee | 28 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.73k | £11.69k | £15.56k | £12.40k | £12.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.51k | £5.71k | £11.46k | £9.96k | £20.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £8.00k | £3.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28TH OCTOBER 1970
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HOLCOMBE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOLCOMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Field Gate
Common Lane
Holcombe
Radstock
BA3 5DP
- Phone:
- 01761233424
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window